TX HB3197 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to naming the main administrative building on the campus of the Texas Tech University Sciences Center in Amarillo in honor of Texas Senator Teel Bivins.
Title
Relating to naming the main administrative building on the campus of the Texas Tech University Sciences Center in Amarillo in honor of Texas Senator Teel Bivins.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-08 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB3197 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB03197I.htm |