TX HB3180 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the canvass of election returns for the offices of governor and lieutenant governor.
Title
Relating to the canvass of election returns for the offices of governor and lieutenant governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR124 (Enabling for) 2015-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB3180 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB03180I.htm |