TX HB3179 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to costs associated with the statewide assessment program of public school students.
Title
Relating to costs associated with the statewide assessment program of public school students.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Electronic Information Systems
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Electronic Information Systems
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3179 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03179I.htm |