TX HB3174 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application of the sales and use tax to certain computer program transactions.
Title
Relating to the application of the sales and use tax to certain computer program transactions.
Sponsors
Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Lyle Larson [R] |
Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |