TX HB3155 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to the expiration and abandonment of stored value cards.
Title
Relating to the expiration and abandonment of stored value cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-03 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-04-03 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |