TX HB3146 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information contained in the annual financial audit of certain regional transportation authorities.
Title
Relating to information contained in the annual financial audit of certain regional transportation authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-05 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1370 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Referred to Transportation