TX HB314 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 20 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on November 20 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the dissemination of criminal history record information by the Department of Public Safety concerning certain intoxication offenses.
Title
Relating to the dissemination of criminal history record information by the Department of Public Safety concerning certain intoxication offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Driver [R] | Rep. Stephen Frost [D] | Rep. Charles Hopson [R] | Rep. Thomas Merritt [R] |
Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-08 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-11-20 | Filed |
Subjects
CRIMINAL RECORDS
INTERNET
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
INTERNET
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID