TX HB3134 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the plugging of inactive oil and gas wells.
Title
Relating to the plugging of inactive oil and gas wells.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-29 | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-29 | Corrected comm. report distributed | |
2011-04-29 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | |
2011-04-26 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-30 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |