TX HB3130 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to federal refundable credits paid directly to issuers of certain bonds issued by or on behalf of school districts or open-enrollment charter schools.
Title
Relating to federal refundable credits paid directly to issuers of certain bonds issued by or on behalf of school districts or open-enrollment charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3130 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03130I.htm |