TX HB3090 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of laws prohibiting outdoor burning of waste and combustible material.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of laws prohibiting outdoor burning of waste and combustible material.
Sponsors
Rep. John Cyrier [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BURNING & INCINERATORS
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
PEACE OFFICERS
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
PEACE OFFICERS