TX HB3089 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to payment of costs related to the relocation of certain political subdivision utility facilities for state highway projects.
Title
Relating to payment of costs related to the relocation of certain political subdivision utility facilities for state highway projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1512 (Same As) 2019-05-28 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3089 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03089I.htm |