TX HB3088 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of requirements for the issuance of local permits by regulatory agencies of political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of requirements for the issuance of local permits by regulatory agencies of political subdivisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |