TX HB3075 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-11 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-11 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of an unmanned aircraft over a correctional facility or detention facility; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the operation of an unmanned aircraft over a correctional facility or detention facility; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#703 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#703 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-11 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-11 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#703 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aeronautics
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement