TX HB3075 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of real property by the University of Houston--Sugar Land.
Title
Relating to the use of real property by the University of Houston--Sugar Land.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-04-25 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON-SUGAR LAND
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON-SUGAR LAND
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB3075 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB03075I.htm |