TX HB3054 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Summary
Relating to the use of certain refrigerants in motor vehicle air conditioning units.
Title
Relating to the use of certain refrigerants in motor vehicle air conditioning units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Companion considered in lieu of in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2019 (Same As) 2009-05-30 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
REFRIGERANTS & REFRIGERATION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Environment--Air
REFRIGERANTS & REFRIGERATION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General