TX HB3031 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedure for obtaining a right to use state water if the applicant proposes an alternative source of water that is not state water.
Title
Relating to the procedure for obtaining a right to use state water if the applicant proposes an alternative source of water that is not state water.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-19 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Special Water Districts by chair |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
WATER
Water--General
Water--Rights
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
WATER
Water--General
Water--Rights
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3031 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03031I.htm |