TX HB3031 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the sale by the Brazos River Authority of certain residential and commercial leased lots and other real property in the immediate vicinity of Possum Kingdom Lake.
Title
Relating to the sale by the Brazos River Authority of certain residential and commercial leased lots and other real property in the immediate vicinity of Possum Kingdom Lake.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Effective immediately | |
2009-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-15 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-15 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-15 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-11 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-28 | Amended | |
2009-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
BRAZOS RIVER AUTHORITY
FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
POSSUM KINGDOM LAKE
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
POSSUM KINGDOM LAKE
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities