TX HB2998 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the reporting and recording of a motor vehicle accident involving an official vehicle driven by a peace officer, firefighter, or an emergency medical services employee in the course of official duties.
Title
Relating to the reporting and recording of a motor vehicle accident involving an official vehicle driven by a peace officer, firefighter, or an emergency medical services employee in the course of official duties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2194 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Subjects
ACCIDENTS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
PEACE OFFICERS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
PEACE OFFICERS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses