TX HB2974 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain sexual offenses; creating a criminal offense; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to certain sexual offenses; creating a criminal offense; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
PORNOGRAPHY
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
PORNOGRAPHY