TX HB2972 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to licensing of certain health facilities.
Title
Relating to licensing of certain health facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-23 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Passed | |
2009-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Amended | |
2009-05-19 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-19 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-04 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed | |
2009-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-02 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |