TX HB2968 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures for the issuance of certain private activity bonds.
Title
Relating to procedures for the issuance of certain private activity bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#464 (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#432 (Y: 114 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#432 (Y: 114 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#464 |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#432 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOND REVIEW BOARD
BONDS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
BONDS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control