TX HB2968 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the preservation of the Alamo complex and surrounding area and to the Alamo Preservation Advisory Board.
Title
Relating to the preservation of the Alamo complex and surrounding area and to the Alamo Preservation Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - HB 2968Third Reading House (Y: 124 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 2968Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 2968Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-31 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2015-05-30 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-28 | House | House requests conference committee |
2015-05-28 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-21 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR120 (Enabling for) 2015-03-17 - Referred to Appropriations
Subjects
ALAMO, THE
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Historic Preservation & Museums
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Historic Preservation & Museums
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations