TX HB2949 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the verification of the status of certain driver's licenses before renting a motor vehicle.
Title
Relating to the verification of the status of certain driver's licenses before renting a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Janie Lopez [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1323 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Transportation
SB1323 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Transportation
SB1323 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Transportation