TX HB2947 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exception of an audit working paper of a hospital district from required disclosure under the public information law.
Title
Relating to the exception of an audit working paper of a hospital district from required disclosure under the public information law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Open Government, Select | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2011-03-17 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
AUDITS & AUDITORS
Open Records
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
AUDITS & AUDITORS
Open Records
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital