TX HB2945 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-32)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to payment card skimmers on motor fuel dispensers and to creating a payment fraud fusion center; imposing civil penalties; creating criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to payment card skimmers on motor fuel dispensers and to creating a payment fraud fusion center; imposing civil penalties; creating criminal offenses.

Sponsors

Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]
Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Terry Meza [D]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]
Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. John Wray [R]
Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1689 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#893 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1689
2019-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed
2019-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateAmended
2019-05-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Zaffirini
2019-05-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-03SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-03SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#893
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1648 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback