TX HB2940 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the ownership, control, or operation of a franchised or nonfranchised dealer or dealership by certain motor vehicle manufacturers and distributors.
Title
Relating to the ownership, control, or operation of a franchised or nonfranchised dealer or dealership by certain motor vehicle manufacturers and distributors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1415 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General