TX HB2937 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of a pilot program under which a licensed hospital may offer dual credit courses to public high school students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of a pilot program under which a licensed hospital may offer dual credit courses to public high school students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1980 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - FA2 Seliger (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective immediately
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28SenateLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-28SenatePostponed
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-27HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-26SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse requests conference committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-12SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-09HouseAmended
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-01HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-30HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2937
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02937I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02937H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02937E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02937S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02937F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2937&RcdVtNo=1049&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=68
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=72
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2937&RcdVtNo=1980&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=68

Bill Comments

feedback