TX HB2936 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an optional service retirement annuity of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to an optional service retirement annuity of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. James Frank [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |