TX HB2912 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a violation of the Texas Residential Property Owners Protection Act or a dedicatory instrument by a board member of a property owners' association and to the recall of a board member.
Title
Relating to a violation of the Texas Residential Property Owners Protection Act or a dedicatory instrument by a board member of a property owners' association and to the recall of a board member.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] | Rep. Jacey Jetton [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#967 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#967 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Vasut |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |