TX HB29 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing the provision of temporary secure storage for weapons at certain public buildings; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing the provision of temporary secure storage for weapons at certain public buildings; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1570 (Y: 102 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#313 (Y: 109 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#290 (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1570
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenatePassed
2021-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenateAmended
2021-05-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-05-20SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-06SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#313
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#290
2021-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB29
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00029I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00029H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00029S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00029F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00029S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00029I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00029H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00029E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00029E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00029S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00029S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00029F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB29&RcdVtNo=290&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB29&RcdVtNo=313&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=43
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB29&RcdVtNo=1570&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback