TX HB29 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring certain general academic teaching institutions to offer a fixed tuition price plan to undergraduate students.
Title
Relating to requiring certain general academic teaching institutions to offer a fixed tuition price plan to undergraduate students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-26 - House - HB 29Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - HB 29Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - HB 29Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-23 | House | House requests conference committee |
2013-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-05-01 | House | Amended |
2013-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS