TX HB2893 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedures for transferring certain cases and proceedings between courts.
Title
Relating to the procedures for transferring certain cases and proceedings between courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#853 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#853 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Juries
Courts--Personnel
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Probate
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Juries
Courts--Personnel
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Probate
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates
RECORDS MANAGEMENT