TX HB2889 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Postponed 6/1/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the calculation, collection, and remittance of state hotel occupancy taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the calculation, collection, and remittance of state hotel occupancy taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HousePostponed 6/1/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-18HouseRead first time
2021-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback