TX HB2887 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of property seized by the Texas Department of Public Safety in connection with violations of the Texas Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Relating to the disposition of property seized by the Texas Department of Public Safety in connection with violations of the Texas Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-10 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-03 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-03-17 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
CONTRABAND
CRIMINAL ASSET FORFEITURE
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
CRIMINAL ASSET FORFEITURE
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations