TX HB2884 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Failed to pass to engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Failed to pass to engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to statewide technology centers and cloud computing services.
Title
Relating to statewide technology centers and cloud computing services.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Dade Phelan [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D] |
Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Amended 1-Miller |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2383 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions