TX HB2877 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-08 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-08 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the Texas Theft Liability Act to certain claims by inmates for lost, damaged, or confiscated property.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the Texas Theft Liability Act to certain claims by inmates for lost, damaged, or confiscated property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-04 - House - HB 2877Third Reading House (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-04 | House | Passed |
2013-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property