TX HB2852 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipal fees charged to public school districts for water and sewer service.
Title
Relating to municipal fees charged to public school districts for water and sewer service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Utilities
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
City Government--Utilities
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer