TX HB2852 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring signs at intersections with photographic traffic monitoring systems and photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.
Title
Relating to requiring signs at intersections with photographic traffic monitoring systems and photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2011-03-17 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNALS
SIGNS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
City Government--General
PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNALS
SIGNS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB2852 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB02852I.htm |