TX HB2826 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 79-5)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procurement of a contingent fee contract for legal services by certain governmental entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procurement of a contingent fee contract for legal services by certain governmental entities.

Sponsors

Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]
Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]
Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Sen. Joan Huffman [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#925 (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#925
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-01HouseAmended 3-Lucio
2019-05-01HouseAmended 2-Clardy
2019-05-01HouseAmended 1-Huberty
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB28 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback