TX HB2822 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the availability of antipsychotic prescription drugs under the vendor drug program and Medicaid managed care.
Title
Relating to the availability of antipsychotic prescription drugs under the vendor drug program and Medicaid managed care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#976 (Y: 112 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#976 (Y: 112 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-24 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#976 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB674 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Human Services
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse