TX HB281 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right of one immediate family member of certain deceased peace officers to make an oral statement regarding the terms of a plea bargain agreement.
Title
Relating to the right of one immediate family member of certain deceased peace officers to make an oral statement regarding the terms of a plea bargain agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - HB 281Third Reading House (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - HB 281Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - HB 281Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-27 | House | Record vote |
2013-03-27 | House | Passed |
2013-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-03-26 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-03-26 | House | Amended |
2013-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-03-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2013-02-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2012-12-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Criminal Procedure--Trial
Family
Family--General
PEACE OFFICERS
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Criminal Procedure--Trial
Family
Family--General
PEACE OFFICERS