TX HB28 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Summary
Relating to requiring notice by a seller of real property of potential annexation of the property by a municipality.
Title
Relating to requiring notice by a seller of real property of potential annexation of the property by a municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Annexation
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
Property Interests--Real Property
City Government--Annexation
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
Property Interests--Real Property