TX HB2782 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the method used in rating public school districts and campuses for accountability purposes.
Title
Relating to the method used in rating public school districts and campuses for accountability purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1229 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | House | Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts