TX HB2782 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the commissioner of insurance to disapprove rate changes for certain health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to the authority of the commissioner of insurance to disapprove rate changes for certain health benefit plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-04 | House | Passed |
2013-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE RATES
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
INSURANCE RATES
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents