TX HB2773 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of the time payment fee imposed on certain persons convicted of an offense.
Title
Relating to the repeal of the time payment fee imposed on certain persons convicted of an offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2773 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02773I.htm |