TX HB2751 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the liability of individuals providing labor or assistance to the Texas Forest Service in the performance of certain fire suppression duties.
Title
Relating to the liability of individuals providing labor or assistance to the Texas Forest Service in the performance of certain fire suppression duties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-04-25 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
FOREST SERVICE, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
FOREST SERVICE, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--General