TX HB2747 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of massage therapy.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of massage therapy.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] | Rep. Gina Calanni [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1970 (Y: 91 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#891 (Y: 113 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1970 (Y: 91 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#891 (Y: 113 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1970 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#891 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1433 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL RECORDS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MASSAGE THERAPY & MASSAGE THERAPISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC NOTICE
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL RECORDS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MASSAGE THERAPY & MASSAGE THERAPISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC NOTICE