TX HB2740 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the posting of certain business and occupational licensing information on state agency websites and the Texas Veterans Portal.
Title
Relating to the posting of certain business and occupational licensing information on state agency websites and the Texas Veterans Portal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1142 (Y: 120 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1142 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
INTERNET
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS