TX HB2732 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibited reporting of information regarding debt incurred for nonemergency medical care.
Title
Relating to prohibited reporting of information regarding debt incurred for nonemergency medical care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Consumer Protection
CREDIT REPORTS
DEBT
Financial
Financial--General
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Business & Commerce--General
Consumer Protection
CREDIT REPORTS
DEBT
Financial
Financial--General
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2732 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02732I.htm |