TX HB2725 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to birth records of adopted persons; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to birth records of adopted persons; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-15HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback